THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:53:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Karachi, 1976
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lakeridge Health Bowmanville
Department of Anaesthesia
47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 2N4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 623-3331
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 01 Sep 2006
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Lakeridge Health Clarington Site Bowmanville
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Clarington Site
LOCATION: Bowmanville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Zubair Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Zubair (CPSO#: 72986 )
Business Address: Lakeridge Health Bowmanville
Department of Anesthesia
47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 2N4
(905) 623-3331

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: University of Karachi, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lakeridge Health Bowmanville
Department of Anaesthesia
47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 2N4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 623-3331
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 01 Sep 2006
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Lakeridge Health Clarington Site Bowmanville
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Clarington Site
LOCATION: Bowmanville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Zubair Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Zubair (CPSO#: 72986 )
Business Address: Lakeridge Health Bowmanville
Department of Anesthesia
47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 2N4
(905) 623-3331

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
19 Oct 2007
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Oct 19 2007
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Naeem Ahmad Zubair may practise independently in the area of Anaesthesia
only.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Naeem Ahmad Zubair may practise independently in the area of Anaesthesia
only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Karachi, 1976

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 19 Oct 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 19 Oct 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Jan 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jul 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1998
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 19 Oct 2007

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 19 Oct 2007

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2006
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 18 Jan 2006

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jan 2006
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 16 Jan 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Aug 1998