THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
25/05/25 03:34:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 373 Commissioners Rd W
London ON N6J 1Y4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-663-3019
Fax: 519-685-5519

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B. Abu Rafea Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Aug 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Abu Rafea (CPSO#: 73020 )
Business Address: LHSC Victoria Hospital
Department of Obstetrics and Gynaecology
Room E3-641
800 Commissioners Road
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 663-3019
Business Address: 373 Commissioners Road West
Dr. Basim Abu Rafea
London Ontario N6J 1Y4
5196633019

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 373 Commissioners Rd W
London ON N6J 1Y4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-663-3019
Fax: 519-685-5519

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B. Abu Rafea Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Aug 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Abu Rafea (CPSO#: 73020 )
Business Address: LHSC Victoria Hospital
Department of Obstetrics and Gynaecology
Room E3-641
800 Commissioners Road
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 663-3019
Business Address: 373 Commissioners Road West
Dr. Basim Abu Rafea
London Ontario N6J 1Y4
5196633019

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BASIM FOUAD A ABU RAFEA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABU RAFEA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BASIM FOUAD A ABU RAFEA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABU RAFEA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2024
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2024
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jan 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 1998
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Feb 2024

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jan 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 03 Jan 2024

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Feb 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jan 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Aug 1998