THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:53:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Zimbabwe, 1986
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 624-115 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke ON M9V 0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-748-0238
Fax: 905-497-6114

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 31 Dec 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 Mar 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 01 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
South Africa

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Abdul Aziz Walele Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Walele (CPSO#: 73022 )
Business Address: Suite 100
3 Connestoga Drive
Brampton Ontario L6Z 4N5
(905) 216-0238
Business Address: Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3S7
Business Address: Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
Business Address: 102-157 Queen St E
Brampton ON L6W 3X4
Business Address: 624-115 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke ON M9V 0A9
416-748-0238

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Zimbabwe, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 624-115 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke ON M9V 0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-748-0238
Fax: 905-497-6114

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 31 Dec 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 Mar 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 01 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
South Africa

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Abdul Aziz Walele Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Walele (CPSO#: 73022 )
Business Address: Suite 100
3 Connestoga Drive
Brampton Ontario L6Z 4N5
(905) 216-0238
Business Address: Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3S7
Business Address: Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
Business Address: 102-157 Queen St E
Brampton ON L6W 3X4
Business Address: 624-115 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke ON M9V 0A9
416-748-0238

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABDUL AZIZ WALELE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALELE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABDUL AZIZ WALELE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALELE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Zimbabwe, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Apr 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Apr 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Apr 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 21 Jun 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 01 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1998
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Apr 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 14 Apr 2008

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 2003
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Apr 2003

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Nov 2002

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2002

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2001

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2000

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2000
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Aug 1998