THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:21:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1981
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 320 Byron St S
Whitby ON L1N 4P8
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 9056685835
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Boulos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Feb 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Boulos (CPSO#: 73026 )
Business Address: 1801 Dundas Street East
Whitby Ontario L1N 7C5
Business Address: 200-320 Byron St S
Whitby ON L1N 4P8
905-668-5835

Corporation Name: Y. Boulos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 Jun 2006

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 320 Byron St S
Whitby ON L1N 4P8
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 9056685835
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Boulos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Feb 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Boulos (CPSO#: 73026 )
Business Address: 1801 Dundas Street East
Whitby Ontario L1N 7C5
Business Address: 200-320 Byron St S
Whitby ON L1N 4P8
905-668-5835

Corporation Name: Y. Boulos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 Jun 2006

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YOUSSEF RIZK TADROS BOULOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOULOS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YOUSSEF RIZK TADROS BOULOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOULOS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 1998
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Aug 1998