THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 07:09:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Karachi, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital
Riverside Campus Suite 5-25
1967 Riverside
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 738-8400
Extension: 82537
Fax: (613) 738-8337

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 29 Apr 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 29 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
Hawkesbury and District General Hospital Hawkesbury
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Bruyere Continuing Care Ottawa
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Cornwall Community Hospital
LOCATION: Cornwall

HOSPITAL: Hawkesbury and District General Hospital
LOCATION: Hawkesbury

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Akbari Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Akbari (CPSO#: 73060 )
Business Address: 1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Address: 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital
Riverside Campus Suite 5-25
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
(613) 798-5555 Extn: 82537
Business Address: 566 Louise Street
Winchester Ontario K0C 2K0

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU
Medical School: University of Karachi, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital
Riverside Campus Suite 5-25
1967 Riverside
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 738-8400
Extension: 82537
Fax: (613) 738-8337

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 29 Apr 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 29 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
Hawkesbury and District General Hospital Hawkesbury
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Bruyere Continuing Care Ottawa
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Cornwall Community Hospital
LOCATION: Cornwall

HOSPITAL: Hawkesbury and District General Hospital
LOCATION: Hawkesbury

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Akbari Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Akbari (CPSO#: 73060 )
Business Address: 1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Address: 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital
Riverside Campus Suite 5-25
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
(613) 798-5555 Extn: 82537
Business Address: 566 Louise Street
Winchester Ontario K0C 2K0

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AYUB AKBARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AKBARI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AYUB AKBARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AKBARI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Karachi, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 13 Sep 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 1998
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Sep 1999

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 13 Sep 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 1998