THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:17:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1996
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PUSHTO, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 580
2525 Old Bronte Road
Oakville Ontario L6M 4J2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 338-0550
Fax: (905) 338-3187

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nageen Hameed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Apr 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Hameed (CPSO#: 73081 )
Business Address: Unit 580
2525 Old Bronte Road
Oakville Ontario L6M 4J2
(905) 338-0550

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PUSHTO, URDU
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 580
2525 Old Bronte Road
Oakville Ontario L6M 4J2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 338-0550
Fax: (905) 338-3187

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nageen Hameed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Apr 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Hameed (CPSO#: 73081 )
Business Address: Unit 580
2525 Old Bronte Road
Oakville Ontario L6M 4J2
(905) 338-0550

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NAGEEN HAMEED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMEED is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NAGEEN HAMEED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMEED is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 21 Oct 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 1998
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 2001

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 21 Oct 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 1998