THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 03:02:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Delhi, 1986
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite# 2
31 Steeplebush Avenue
Brampton Ontario L6R 3B4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 458-2287
Fax: (905) 458 2287

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L & S Chaudhry Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jul 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chaudhry (CPSO#: 78847 ) Dr. L. Chaudhry (CPSO#: 73124 )
Business Address: 2 - 31 Steeplebush Avenue
Brampton Ontario L6R 3B4
(905) 458-2287

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: University of Delhi, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite# 2
31 Steeplebush Avenue
Brampton Ontario L6R 3B4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 458-2287
Fax: (905) 458 2287

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L & S Chaudhry Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jul 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chaudhry (CPSO#: 78847 ) Dr. L. Chaudhry (CPSO#: 73124 )
Business Address: 2 - 31 Steeplebush Avenue
Brampton Ontario L6R 3B4
(905) 458-2287

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LOVE RAJ CHAUDHRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAUDHRY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LOVE RAJ CHAUDHRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAUDHRY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Delhi, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 1998
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Oct 1998