THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/05/25 03:20:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kanata North Medical Centre
832 March Road
Kanata Ontario K2W 0C9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 599-5599
Fax: (613) 599-1005

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elizabeth Caskey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Feb 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Caskey (CPSO#: 73166 )
Business Address: Kanata North Medical Centre
832 March Road
Suite 2
Kanata Ontario K2W 0C9
(613) 599-5599

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kanata North Medical Centre
832 March Road
Kanata Ontario K2W 0C9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 599-5599
Fax: (613) 599-1005

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elizabeth Caskey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Feb 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Caskey (CPSO#: 73166 )
Business Address: Kanata North Medical Centre
832 March Road
Suite 2
Kanata Ontario K2W 0C9
(613) 599-5599

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELIZABETH ROSEMARY BERNICE CASKEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CASKEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELIZABETH ROSEMARY BERNICE CASKEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CASKEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 08 Jan 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 1998
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jan 2000

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 08 Jan 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Dec 1998