THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 04:01:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universite of Rene Descartes (Paris V), 1980
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite DI
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 46521
Fax: (905) 577-1443
Address: 218-1 Young St
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1T8
Phone: (905) 572-6868
Fax: (905) 572-6860

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 23 Oct 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 23 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Koff Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Nov 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Koff (CPSO#: 73189 )
Business Address: 237 Barton Street East
Suite Dl
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 46521
Business Address: 1 Young Street
Suite 218
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1T8
(905) 572-6868
Business Address: 1200 Main Street West
Suite 4N49
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 43940

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Universite of Rene Descartes (Paris V), 1980

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite DI
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 46521
Fax: (905) 577-1443
Address: 218-1 Young St
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1T8
Phone: (905) 572-6868
Fax: (905) 572-6860

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 23 Oct 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 23 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Koff Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Nov 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Koff (CPSO#: 73189 )
Business Address: 237 Barton Street East
Suite Dl
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 46521
Business Address: 1 Young Street
Suite 218
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1T8
(905) 572-6868
Business Address: 1200 Main Street West
Suite 4N49
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 43940

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
11 Sep 2015
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Sep 11 2015
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. David Alain Koff may practice medicine independently in diagnostic
radiology.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. David Alain Koff may practice medicine independently in diagnostic
radiology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universite of Rene Descartes (Paris V), 1980

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 11 Sep 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Mar 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Feb 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 16 Sep 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 08 Oct 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 1998
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 11 Sep 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Sep 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 11 Sep 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Mar 2010

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Mar 2010

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 2008
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 Feb 2008

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 2005

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jan 2004
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 14 Jan 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 08 Oct 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Dec 1998