THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:01:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 9401 Jane Street
Suite 123
Vaughan Ontario L6A 4H7
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: (905) 553-4232
Fax: (905) 553-6232
Address: 2951 Walkers Line
Burlington Ontario L7M 4Y1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2291 Kipling Avenue
Etobicoke Ontario M9W 4L6
Phone: (416) 741-2798
Fax: (905) 553-6232
Address: 596 Davis Dr
Southlake Regional Health Centre
Department of internal medicine
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Suite 2C - 2nd Floor
Stoney Creek Ontario L8J 3W2
Phone: (833)962-5359
Fax: (888)825-5359

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 12 Sep 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 12 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K. Qureshy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jan 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Qureshy (CPSO#: 73200 )
Business Address: 2951 Walkers Line
Burlington Ontario L7M 4Y1
(833) 962-5359
Business Address: 123 - 9401 Jane Street
Maple Ontario L6A 4H7
(905) 534-7232
Business Address: 2D - 35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Stoney Creek Ontario L8J 3W2
(833) 962-5359
Business Address: 2291 Kipling Avenue
Etobicoke Ontario M9W 4L6
(416) 240-7608

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 9401 Jane Street
Suite 123
Vaughan Ontario L6A 4H7
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: (905) 553-4232
Fax: (905) 553-6232
Address: 2951 Walkers Line
Burlington Ontario L7M 4Y1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2291 Kipling Avenue
Etobicoke Ontario M9W 4L6
Phone: (416) 741-2798
Fax: (905) 553-6232
Address: 596 Davis Dr
Southlake Regional Health Centre
Department of internal medicine
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Suite 2C - 2nd Floor
Stoney Creek Ontario L8J 3W2
Phone: (833)962-5359
Fax: (888)825-5359

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 12 Sep 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 12 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K. Qureshy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jan 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Qureshy (CPSO#: 73200 )
Business Address: 2951 Walkers Line
Burlington Ontario L7M 4Y1
(833) 962-5359
Business Address: 123 - 9401 Jane Street
Maple Ontario L6A 4H7
(905) 534-7232
Business Address: 2D - 35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Stoney Creek Ontario L8J 3W2
(833) 962-5359
Business Address: 2291 Kipling Avenue
Etobicoke Ontario M9W 4L6
(416) 240-7608

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAMRAN SALEEM QURESHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QURESHY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAMRAN SALEEM QURESHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QURESHY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 May 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Feb 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 1999
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 May 2002

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Feb 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jan 1999