THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:44:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 29
7010 Warden Avenue
Markham Ontario L3R 5Y3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 944-0270
Fax: (905) 513-6634

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Dec 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Bessie Li Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jun 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Li (CPSO#: 73220 )
Business Address: 29 - 7010 Warden Avenue
Markham Ontario L3R 5Y3
(905) 944-0270

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, MANDARIN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 29
7010 Warden Avenue
Markham Ontario L3R 5Y3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 944-0270
Fax: (905) 513-6634

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Dec 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Bessie Li Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jun 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Li (CPSO#: 73220 )
Business Address: 29 - 7010 Warden Avenue
Markham Ontario L3R 5Y3
(905) 944-0270

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BESSIE LI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BESSIE LI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 10 Jan 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 1999
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jan 2001

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 10 Jan 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jan 1999