THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 07:04:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Edinburgh, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Ave
M3-200
Department of Anesthesia
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 480 4864
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 01 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. CJL McCartney Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Jun 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. C. McCartney (CPSO#: 73247 )
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 798-5555
Business Address: 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
6132903896

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Edinburgh, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Ave
M3-200
Department of Anesthesia
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 480 4864
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 01 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. CJL McCartney Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Jun 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. C. McCartney (CPSO#: 73247 )
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 798-5555
Business Address: 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
6132903896

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. COLIN JOHN LINDSAY MCCARTNEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCARTNEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. COLIN JOHN LINDSAY MCCARTNEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCARTNEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Edinburgh, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Jul 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 02 Feb 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 08 Mar 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Mar 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Mar 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 1999
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 2005

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 02 Feb 2005

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 08 Mar 2003

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Mar 2002
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 14 Mar 2002

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 14 Mar 2002

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Mar 2000
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 Mar 2000

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Mar 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Feb 1999