THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:10:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 217 Turcotte Park Road
Mattawa Hospital
Mattawa Ontario P0H 1V0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 61 5th Street
Englehart Ontario P0J 1H0
Phone: (705) 544-2301
Extension: 5226
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 145 Government Rd E
Kirkland Lake Ontario P2N 3P4
Phone: 705-567-5251
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 520-9300 Airport Rd
Latitude Air Ambulance
Mount Hope ON L0R 1W0
Phone: (289) 426-1133
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 28 Oct 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 28 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital de Mattawa Hospital Inc. Mattawa
Kirkland and District Hospital Kirkland Lake
Englehart and District Hospital Englehart
HOSPITAL: Hopital de Mattawa Hospital Inc.
LOCATION: Mattawa

HOSPITAL: Kirkland and District Hospital
LOCATION: Kirkland Lake

HOSPITAL: Englehart and District Hospital
LOCATION: Englehart

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Blundell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Oct 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Blundell (CPSO#: 73283 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 217 Turcotte Park Road
Mattawa Hospital
Mattawa Ontario P0H 1V0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 61 5th Street
Englehart Ontario P0J 1H0
Phone: (705) 544-2301
Extension: 5226
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 145 Government Rd E
Kirkland Lake Ontario P2N 3P4
Phone: 705-567-5251
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 520-9300 Airport Rd
Latitude Air Ambulance
Mount Hope ON L0R 1W0
Phone: (289) 426-1133
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 28 Oct 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 28 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital de Mattawa Hospital Inc. Mattawa
Kirkland and District Hospital Kirkland Lake
Englehart and District Hospital Englehart
HOSPITAL: Hopital de Mattawa Hospital Inc.
LOCATION: Mattawa

HOSPITAL: Kirkland and District Hospital
LOCATION: Kirkland Lake

HOSPITAL: Englehart and District Hospital
LOCATION: Englehart

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Blundell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Oct 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Blundell (CPSO#: 73283 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SEAN INGHAM BLUNDELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLUNDELL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SEAN INGHAM BLUNDELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLUNDELL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Feb 1999
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Feb 1999