THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:55:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ibadan College of Medicine, 1986
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, YORUBA

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: unit 110-419 King Street West
The galleria
Oshawa Mall
Oshawa Ontario L1J 2H9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056685560
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court Road
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 04 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. O.A. Akingbola Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Akingbola (CPSO#: 73290 )
Business Address: Dundas Medical Centre
Unit 306
220 Dunas Street West
Whitby Ontario L1N 8M7
(905) 668-5560

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, YORUBA
Medical School: University of Ibadan College of Medicine, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: unit 110-419 King Street West
The galleria
Oshawa Mall
Oshawa Ontario L1J 2H9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056685560
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court Road
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 04 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. O.A. Akingbola Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Akingbola (CPSO#: 73290 )
Business Address: Dundas Medical Centre
Unit 306
220 Dunas Street West
Whitby Ontario L1N 8M7
(905) 668-5560

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OLUROTIMI AKINTAYO AKINGBOLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AKINGBOLA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OLUROTIMI AKINTAYO AKINGBOLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AKINGBOLA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ibadan College of Medicine, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Feb 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 1999
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Sep 2000

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Feb 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Mar 1999