THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:28:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Cambridge Street North
Bruyere-St Vincent site
Ottawa Ontario K1R 7A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-562-6398
Fax: 613-562-6394

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Bruyere Continuing Care Ottawa
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Rice Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 May 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Rice (CPSO#: 73305 )
Business Address: 60 Cambridge Street North
Bruyere-St. Vincent Site
Ottawa Ontario K1R 6K9
613-562-6398
Business Address: Elisabeth Bruyere Hospital
Bruyere Continuing Care
43 Bruyere Street
Suite 264 J-H
Ottawa Ontario K1N 5C8
(613) 562-6398

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Cambridge Street North
Bruyere-St Vincent site
Ottawa Ontario K1R 7A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-562-6398
Fax: 613-562-6394

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Bruyere Continuing Care Ottawa
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Rice Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 May 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Rice (CPSO#: 73305 )
Business Address: 60 Cambridge Street North
Bruyere-St. Vincent Site
Ottawa Ontario K1R 6K9
613-562-6398
Business Address: Elisabeth Bruyere Hospital
Bruyere Continuing Care
43 Bruyere Street
Suite 264 J-H
Ottawa Ontario K1N 5C8
(613) 562-6398

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JILL LORRAINE RICE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RICE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JILL LORRAINE RICE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RICE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 27 Apr 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 1999
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Aug 2001

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 27 Apr 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 1999