THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:34:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: The University of Western Australia Faculty of Health and Medical Sciences, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: HHSC General Hospital Campus
Thrombosis Service McMaster Clinic
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 527-4322
Extension: 40323
Fax: (905) 521-1551

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 03 Apr 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 03 Apr 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 03 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 03 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. John Eikelboom Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jan 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Eikelboom (CPSO#: 73308 )
Business Address: Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 531-5969

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: The University of Western Australia Faculty of Health and Medical Sciences, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: HHSC General Hospital Campus
Thrombosis Service McMaster Clinic
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 527-4322
Extension: 40323
Fax: (905) 521-1551

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 03 Apr 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 03 Apr 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 03 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 03 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. John Eikelboom Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jan 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Eikelboom (CPSO#: 73308 )
Business Address: Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 531-5969

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN WILLIAM ANDREW EIKELBOOM may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the DEPARTMENT OF MEDICINE, DIVISION OF HEMATOLOGY AND THROMBOEMBOLISM MCMASTER UNIVERSITY in which Dr. EIKELBOOM holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;
(2) Dr. EIKELBOOM may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);
(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. EIKELBOOM no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,
(ii) When Dr. EIKELBOOM no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,
(iii) When Dr. EIKELBOOM no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.

1. Dr. John William Andrew Eikelboom may practise medicine only,

(i) in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the
Department of Medicine, Division of Haematology, McMaster
University, in which Dr. Eikelboom holds a geographical full-time
teaching or research appointment at the rank of Associate
Professor, and

(ii) to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of
his appointment.

2. The certificate of registration will automatically expire when Dr.
Eikelboom no longer holds the appointment referred to in clause 1.

Note: This certificate has an interim expiry date of October 15, 2009, which
will be extended subject to Dr. Eikelboom's continuing compliance with
the terms and conditions of his registration with the College.

(2) Dr. EIKELBOOM may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);
(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. EIKELBOOM no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,
(ii) When Dr. EIKELBOOM no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,
(iii) When Dr. EIKELBOOM no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN WILLIAM ANDREW EIKELBOOM may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the DEPARTMENT OF MEDICINE, DIVISION OF HEMATOLOGY AND THROMBOEMBOLISM MCMASTER UNIVERSITY in which Dr. EIKELBOOM holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;
(2) Dr. EIKELBOOM may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);
(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. EIKELBOOM no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,
(ii) When Dr. EIKELBOOM no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,
(iii) When Dr. EIKELBOOM no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.

1. Dr. John William Andrew Eikelboom may practise medicine only,

(i) in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the
Department of Medicine, Division of Haematology, McMaster
University, in which Dr. Eikelboom holds a geographical full-time
teaching or research appointment at the rank of Associate
Professor, and

(ii) to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of
his appointment.

2. The certificate of registration will automatically expire when Dr.
Eikelboom no longer holds the appointment referred to in clause 1.

Note: This certificate has an interim expiry date of October 15, 2009, which
will be extended subject to Dr. Eikelboom's continuing compliance with
the terms and conditions of his registration with the College.

(2) Dr. EIKELBOOM may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);
(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. EIKELBOOM no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,
(ii) When Dr. EIKELBOOM no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,
(iii) When Dr. EIKELBOOM no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: The University of Western Australia Faculty of Health and Medical Sciences, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Apr 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 21 Dec 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 1999
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 11 Apr 2007

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Apr 2007

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 21 Dec 2006

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jan 2005
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 25 Jan 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Mar 1999