THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:21:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of Warsaw Faculty of Medicine, 1978
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 102 - 477 King Street
Welland Ontario L3B 3K4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 788-1406
Fax: (905) 788-9674

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 07 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jerzy Sternadel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jan 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Sternadel (CPSO#: 73345 )
Business Address: 102 - 477 King Street
Welland Ontario L3B 3K4
(905) 788-1406

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH
Medical School: Medical University of Warsaw Faculty of Medicine, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 102 - 477 King Street
Welland Ontario L3B 3K4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 788-1406
Fax: (905) 788-9674

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 07 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jerzy Sternadel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jan 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Sternadel (CPSO#: 73345 )
Business Address: 102 - 477 King Street
Welland Ontario L3B 3K4
(905) 788-1406

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JERZY STERNADEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STERNADEL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JERZY STERNADEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STERNADEL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 16 Aug 2024
Summary:

Re: CAS-XXXXXX-XXX1G4
 
Caution-in-Person: 

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015. 

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:   


Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 16 Aug 2024
Summary:

Re: CAS-XXXXXX-XXX1G4
 
Caution-in-Person: 

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015. 

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:   


Training

Medical School: Medical University of Warsaw Faculty of Medicine, 1978

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 May 1999
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 May 1999