THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:51:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 735 St Clair Street
Anjema Eye Institute
Chatham Ontario N7L 0E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 380 0008
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Unit 6 - 2 Main Street S
Anjema Eye Institute
Bayfield Ontario N0M 1G0
Phone: 226 408 8578
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 276 Mud St W
Lasik MD Hamilton
Hamilton Ontario L8J 3Z6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: R40-142 Fullarton St
London ON N6A 0A4
Phone: +1 855-756-2020
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Lasik MD Mississauga
5025 Orbitor Dr
Bldg 2 - 3rd Floor
Mississauga Ontario L4W 4Y5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 10-407 Laurier Ave W
Ottawa ON K1R 7Y7
Phone: 613 232 2444
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 120-2235 Sheppard Ave E
Toronto ON M2J 5B5
Phone: 5198093097
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 200 Columbia St
TLC Laser Eye Centre Waterloo
University of Waterloo, School of Optometry
Waterloo ON N2L 3G1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Other Health and Non-Health Professions

PROFESSION JURISDICTION
Teaching Canada - Ontario
PROFESSION: Teaching
JURISDICTION: Canada - Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Chatham Public General Hospital Society Chatham
St Joseph's Health Services Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
HOSPITAL: Chatham Public General Hospital Society
LOCATION: Chatham

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Services Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christopher M. Anjema Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jan 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Anjema (CPSO#: 73372 )
Business Address: 735 St Clair Street
Chatham Ontario N7M 5J7
(519) 380-0008
Business Address: 2 Main Street South
Unit #6
Bayfield Ontario N0M 1G0
548-248-5766

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 735 St Clair Street
Anjema Eye Institute
Chatham Ontario N7L 0E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 380 0008
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Unit 6 - 2 Main Street S
Anjema Eye Institute
Bayfield Ontario N0M 1G0
Phone: 226 408 8578
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 276 Mud St W
Lasik MD Hamilton
Hamilton Ontario L8J 3Z6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: R40-142 Fullarton St
London ON N6A 0A4
Phone: +1 855-756-2020
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Lasik MD Mississauga
5025 Orbitor Dr
Bldg 2 - 3rd Floor
Mississauga Ontario L4W 4Y5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 10-407 Laurier Ave W
Ottawa ON K1R 7Y7
Phone: 613 232 2444
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 120-2235 Sheppard Ave E
Toronto ON M2J 5B5
Phone: 5198093097
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 200 Columbia St
TLC Laser Eye Centre Waterloo
University of Waterloo, School of Optometry
Waterloo ON N2L 3G1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Other Health and Non-Health Professions

PROFESSION JURISDICTION
Teaching Canada - Ontario
PROFESSION: Teaching
JURISDICTION: Canada - Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Chatham Public General Hospital Society Chatham
St Joseph's Health Services Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
HOSPITAL: Chatham Public General Hospital Society
LOCATION: Chatham

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Services Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christopher M. Anjema Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jan 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Anjema (CPSO#: 73372 )
Business Address: 735 St Clair Street
Chatham Ontario N7M 5J7
(519) 380-0008
Business Address: 2 Main Street South
Unit #6
Bayfield Ontario N0M 1G0
548-248-5766

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL ANJEMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANJEMA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL ANJEMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANJEMA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 22 Mar 2021
Summary of Decision:
On March 22, 2021, the Discipline Committee of the College heard, via videoconference, allegations of Dr. Anjema’s professional misconduct related to his ophthalmology practice, including concerns about aspects of his clinical care, patient communication, clinical documentation and billing practices. Dr. Anjema admitted certain facts and pleaded no contest to others.
 
The hearing proceeded in the presence of Dr. Anjema, counsel for the College and counsel for Dr. Anjema. On the basis of an Agreed Statement of Facts and Statement of Uncontested Facts and Plea, the Committee found that Dr. Anjema committed an act of professional misconduct in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in his care of patients, and engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.
 
Disposition
 
Taking into account an Agreed Statement of Facts Regarding Penalty, and a joint submission from the parties as to an appropriate penalty in this case, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:
 
• Dr. Anjema attend before the Committee to be reprimanded;
• The Registrar suspend Dr. Anjema’s certificate of registration for four months commencing July 1, 2021
• The Registrar place terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Anjema’s certificate of registration, as set out in the Order
• Dr. Anjema pay costs to the College in the amount of $10,370.
 
The Committee’s full reasons for decision were released in May 2021 and are available for review on the College’s website.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): March 22, 2021

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 19 Apr 2017
Summary:
Effective August 20, 2019, Dr. Anjema has completed all elements of this SCERP.

Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 22 Mar 2021
Summary of Decision:
On March 22, 2021, the Discipline Committee of the College heard, via videoconference, allegations of Dr. Anjema’s professional misconduct related to his ophthalmology practice, including concerns about aspects of his clinical care, patient communication, clinical documentation and billing practices. Dr. Anjema admitted certain facts and pleaded no contest to others.
 
The hearing proceeded in the presence of Dr. Anjema, counsel for the College and counsel for Dr. Anjema. On the basis of an Agreed Statement of Facts and Statement of Uncontested Facts and Plea, the Committee found that Dr. Anjema committed an act of professional misconduct in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in his care of patients, and engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.
 
Disposition
 
Taking into account an Agreed Statement of Facts Regarding Penalty, and a joint submission from the parties as to an appropriate penalty in this case, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:
 
• Dr. Anjema attend before the Committee to be reprimanded;
• The Registrar suspend Dr. Anjema’s certificate of registration for four months commencing July 1, 2021
• The Registrar place terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Anjema’s certificate of registration, as set out in the Order
• Dr. Anjema pay costs to the College in the amount of $10,370.
 
The Committee’s full reasons for decision were released in May 2021 and are available for review on the College’s website.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): March 22, 2021

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 19 Apr 2017
Summary:
Effective August 20, 2019, Dr. Anjema has completed all elements of this SCERP.

Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2023
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 26 Jan 2023
Suspension of registration removed. Effective: 01 Nov 2021
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee. Effective: 22 Mar 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 31 Jul 2020
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 22 Nov 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 16 Sep 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 18 May 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Sep 2023

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 26 Jan 2023

DETAILS: Suspension of registration removed.
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2021

DETAILS: Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee.
Date: Effective: 22 Mar 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 22 Nov 2019

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 May 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 18 May 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999