THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 04:05:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Extension: 7691
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Linda Probyn Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jun 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Probyn (CPSO#: 73373 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-6100
Business Address: Room 112
150 College Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 3E2
(416) 978-8797

Corporation Name: Christakis Arenson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 04 Jul 2019

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Extension: 7691
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Linda Probyn Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jun 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Probyn (CPSO#: 73373 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-6100
Business Address: Room 112
150 College Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 3E2
(416) 978-8797

Corporation Name: Christakis Arenson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 04 Jul 2019

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LINDA JEAN PROBYN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PROBYN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LINDA JEAN PROBYN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PROBYN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Feb 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999