THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:45:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 189 Elm St
St Thomas ON N5R 5C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196312030
Extension: 2047
Fax: 5196373218
Address: 15 Bonnie Place
St Thomas Ontario N5R 5T8
Phone: (519) 633-6493
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 350 Burwell Road
St Thomas Ontario N5P 0A3
Phone: 519-631-1030
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
HOSPITAL: Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Tillsonburg

HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Geoff Mills Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Mills (CPSO#: 73374 )
Business Address: 15 Bonnie Place
St Thomas Ontario N5R 5T8
(519) 633-6495
Business Address: 350 Burwell Road
St Thomas Ontario N5P 0A3
(519) 631-1030
Business Address: St. Thomas Elgin General Hospital
189 Elm Street
St Thomas Ontario N5R 5C4
(519) 631-2020 Extn: 2047
Business Address: 167 Rolph Street
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital
Tillsonburg Ontario N4G 3Y9
519-842-3611

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 189 Elm St
St Thomas ON N5R 5C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196312030
Extension: 2047
Fax: 5196373218
Address: 15 Bonnie Place
St Thomas Ontario N5R 5T8
Phone: (519) 633-6493
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 350 Burwell Road
St Thomas Ontario N5P 0A3
Phone: 519-631-1030
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
HOSPITAL: Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Tillsonburg

HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Geoff Mills Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Mills (CPSO#: 73374 )
Business Address: 15 Bonnie Place
St Thomas Ontario N5R 5T8
(519) 633-6495
Business Address: 350 Burwell Road
St Thomas Ontario N5P 0A3
(519) 631-1030
Business Address: St. Thomas Elgin General Hospital
189 Elm Street
St Thomas Ontario N5R 5C4
(519) 631-2020 Extn: 2047
Business Address: 167 Rolph Street
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital
Tillsonburg Ontario N4G 3Y9
519-842-3611

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GEOFFREY CAMERON RITCHIE MILLS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GEOFFREY CAMERON RITCHIE MILLS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999