THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 03:54:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Yorkview Medical Centre
Suite 104
3695 Keele Street
Downsview Ontario M3J 1N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 633-3711
Fax: (416) 633-0521
Address: 1235 Wilson Ave
Humber River Hospital
Family Practice Unit
North York ON M3M 0B2
Phone: 416-242-1000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 431 King Street East
247 Coxwell Ave
Toronto Ontario M5A 1L5
Phone: (416) 368-6304
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2688 Danforth Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 1L7
Phone: 416-699-3000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Neal Belluzzo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Dec 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Belluzzo (CPSO#: 73389 )
Business Address: 287 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4L 3B5
Business Address: Yorkview Medical Centre
Suite 104
3695 Keele Street
Downsview Ontario M3J 1N2
(416) 633-3711
Business Address: 431 King Street East
Toronto Ontario M5A 1L5
(416) 368-6304

Corporation Name: Ryan Belluzzo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Jan 2014

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Yorkview Medical Centre
Suite 104
3695 Keele Street
Downsview Ontario M3J 1N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 633-3711
Fax: (416) 633-0521
Address: 1235 Wilson Ave
Humber River Hospital
Family Practice Unit
North York ON M3M 0B2
Phone: 416-242-1000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 431 King Street East
247 Coxwell Ave
Toronto Ontario M5A 1L5
Phone: (416) 368-6304
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2688 Danforth Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 1L7
Phone: 416-699-3000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Neal Belluzzo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Dec 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Belluzzo (CPSO#: 73389 )
Business Address: 287 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4L 3B5
Business Address: Yorkview Medical Centre
Suite 104
3695 Keele Street
Downsview Ontario M3J 1N2
(416) 633-3711
Business Address: 431 King Street East
Toronto Ontario M5A 1L5
(416) 368-6304

Corporation Name: Ryan Belluzzo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Jan 2014

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NEAL BELLUZZO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BELLUZZO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NEAL BELLUZZO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BELLUZZO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999