THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:17:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 690 Dorval Drive
Suite 300 - 5
Oakville Ontario L6K 3W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 849-4567
Extension: 5
Fax: (905) 849-4591
Address: Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hosp.
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 845-2571
Fax: No Information Available
Address: North Oakville Medical Centre
3075 Hospital Gate
Suite 409
Oakville Ontario L6M 1M1
Phone: (905) 849-4567
Extension: 5
Fax: (905) 849-4591

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 01 Oct 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 01 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Russell Mao Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jul 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Mao (CPSO#: 73391 )
Business Address: Palermo Medical Professional Centre
Suite 340
2525 Old Bronte Road
Oakville Ontario L6M 4J2
(905) 849-4567 Extn: 5
Business Address: 409-3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 1M1
(905) 849-4567 Extn: 5
Business Address: 690 Dorval Drive
Suite 300-5
Oakville Ontario L6K 3W7
(905) 849-4567 Extn: 5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 690 Dorval Drive
Suite 300 - 5
Oakville Ontario L6K 3W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 849-4567
Extension: 5
Fax: (905) 849-4591
Address: Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hosp.
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 845-2571
Fax: No Information Available
Address: North Oakville Medical Centre
3075 Hospital Gate
Suite 409
Oakville Ontario L6M 1M1
Phone: (905) 849-4567
Extension: 5
Fax: (905) 849-4591

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 01 Oct 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 01 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Russell Mao Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jul 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Mao (CPSO#: 73391 )
Business Address: Palermo Medical Professional Centre
Suite 340
2525 Old Bronte Road
Oakville Ontario L6M 4J2
(905) 849-4567 Extn: 5
Business Address: 409-3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 1M1
(905) 849-4567 Extn: 5
Business Address: 690 Dorval Drive
Suite 300-5
Oakville Ontario L6K 3W7
(905) 849-4567 Extn: 5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CUONG RUSSELL MAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CUONG RUSSELL MAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Aug 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999