THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 03:24:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 36 Queen Street East
4-054A Donnelly Wing
St. Michael's Hospital
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 0
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 100 Queensway West
Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Phone: 905-848-7663
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 12 Sep 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 03 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 12 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Unity Health Toronto Toronto
Salvation Army Toronto Grace Health Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Unity Health Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Salvation Army Toronto Grace Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Maham Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Feb 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Maham (CPSO#: 73393 )
Business Address: 30 Bond St
St. Michael's Hospital
Critical Care Division
4054A Donnelly Wing
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Business Address: 100 Queensway W
Mississauga ON L5B 1B8
Business Address: 4001 Leslie St
North York General Hospital
North York ON M2K 1E1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 36 Queen Street East
4-054A Donnelly Wing
St. Michael's Hospital
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 0
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 100 Queensway West
Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Phone: 905-848-7663
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 12 Sep 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 03 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 12 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Unity Health Toronto Toronto
Salvation Army Toronto Grace Health Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Unity Health Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Salvation Army Toronto Grace Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Maham Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Feb 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Maham (CPSO#: 73393 )
Business Address: 30 Bond St
St. Michael's Hospital
Critical Care Division
4054A Donnelly Wing
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Business Address: 100 Queensway W
Mississauga ON L5B 1B8
Business Address: 4001 Leslie St
North York General Hospital
North York ON M2K 1E1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NAVA MAHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAHAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NAVA MAHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAHAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Aug 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999