THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:41:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: West GTA Endoscopy
Sheridan Centre Unit 183
2225 Erin Mills Pkwy
Mississauga Ontario L5K 1T9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 823-0223
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Trillium Health Partners
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Holly Street Endoscopy Clinic
Suite 301
40 Holly St
Toronto Ontario M4S 3C3
Phone: (416) 486-8088
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 20 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Laura Musselman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Aug 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Musselman (CPSO#: 73405 )
Business Address: West GTA Endoscopy
Sheridan Centre
2225 Erin Mills Pkwy
Unit 183
Mississauga Ontario L5K 1T9
(905) 823-0223

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN
Medical School: McMaster University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: West GTA Endoscopy
Sheridan Centre Unit 183
2225 Erin Mills Pkwy
Mississauga Ontario L5K 1T9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 823-0223
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Trillium Health Partners
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Holly Street Endoscopy Clinic
Suite 301
40 Holly St
Toronto Ontario M4S 3C3
Phone: (416) 486-8088
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 20 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Laura Musselman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Aug 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Musselman (CPSO#: 73405 )
Business Address: West GTA Endoscopy
Sheridan Centre
2225 Erin Mills Pkwy
Unit 183
Mississauga Ontario L5K 1T9
(905) 823-0223

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAURA JANE MUSSELMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUSSELMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAURA JANE MUSSELMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUSSELMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999