THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:19:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, KANNADA, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 601 Elmwood Ave
PO Box 675
Department of Medicine, Division of Nephrology
Rochester NY 14642-0002
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 585-274-0202
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 15 Sep 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sankar Prakash Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Aug 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Prakash (CPSO#: 29579 ) Dr. S. Prakash (CPSO#: 73417 )
Business Address: Windsor Medical Clinic
1608 Tecumseh Road West
Windsor Ontario N9B 1T8
(519) 258-4400
Business Address: 6720 Hawthorne Drive
Windsor Ontario N8T 1J9
(519) 944-2295

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, KANNADA, SPANISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 601 Elmwood Ave
PO Box 675
Department of Medicine, Division of Nephrology
Rochester NY 14642-0002
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 585-274-0202
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 15 Sep 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sankar Prakash Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Aug 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Prakash (CPSO#: 29579 ) Dr. S. Prakash (CPSO#: 73417 )
Business Address: Windsor Medical Clinic
1608 Tecumseh Road West
Windsor Ontario N9B 1T8
(519) 258-4400
Business Address: 6720 Hawthorne Drive
Windsor Ontario N8T 1J9
(519) 944-2295

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUMA PRAKASH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRAKASH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUMA PRAKASH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRAKASH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999