THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 04:53:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Geriatric Assessment Unit
The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Extension: 14795
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 04 Nov 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 17 Nov 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 04 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lara Khoury Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jun 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Khoury (CPSO#: 73425 )
Business Address: Geriatric Assessment Unit
The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 798-5555
Business Address: Ottawa Hospital General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 715-8859

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Geriatric Assessment Unit
The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Extension: 14795
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 04 Nov 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 17 Nov 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 04 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lara Khoury Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jun 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Khoury (CPSO#: 73425 )
Business Address: Geriatric Assessment Unit
The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 798-5555
Business Address: Ottawa Hospital General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 715-8859

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LARA KHOURY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHOURY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LARA KHOURY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHOURY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jul 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999