THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:30:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: Barrows, Tammy Lynn (Used Until: 03 Apr 2022) Leon, Tammy Lynn (Used Until: 14 Jun 2004)
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Anaesthesiology
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Room 1401 CCW
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-8187
Fax: (613) 737-8189

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tammy Barrows Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jul 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Byford (CPSO#: 73433 )
Business Address: Department of Anaesthesiology
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Room 1401 CCW
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 737-8187

General Information

Former Name: Barrows, Tammy Lynn (Used Until: 03 Apr 2022) Leon, Tammy Lynn (Used Until: 14 Jun 2004)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Anaesthesiology
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Room 1401 CCW
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-8187
Fax: (613) 737-8189

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tammy Barrows Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jul 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Byford (CPSO#: 73433 )
Business Address: Department of Anaesthesiology
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Room 1401 CCW
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 737-8187

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TAMMY LYNN BYFORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BYFORD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TAMMY LYNN BYFORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BYFORD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999