THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 02:59:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 7750 Bayview Avenue
Shouldice Hospital Ltd
Markham Ontario L3T 5W3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-889-1125
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 7750 Bayview Avenue
Thornhill Ontario L3T 4A3
Phone: 800-291-7750
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Shouldice Hospital Ltd. Markham
HOSPITAL: Shouldice Hospital Ltd.
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Park Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Aug 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Park (CPSO#: 73443 )
Business Address: Stevenson Memorial Hospital
PO Box 4000
200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston Ontario L9R 1W7
(705) 435-6281
Business Address: 7750 Bayview Avenue
Thornhill Ontario L3T 4A3
(800) 291-7750

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 7750 Bayview Avenue
Shouldice Hospital Ltd
Markham Ontario L3T 5W3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-889-1125
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 7750 Bayview Avenue
Thornhill Ontario L3T 4A3
Phone: 800-291-7750
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Shouldice Hospital Ltd. Markham
HOSPITAL: Shouldice Hospital Ltd.
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Park Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Aug 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Park (CPSO#: 73443 )
Business Address: Stevenson Memorial Hospital
PO Box 4000
200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston Ontario L9R 1W7
(705) 435-6281
Business Address: 7750 Bayview Avenue
Thornhill Ontario L3T 4A3
(800) 291-7750

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JONG BUM PARK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JONG BUM PARK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jul 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999