THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:31:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Courtice Health Centre
1450 Highway 2
Courtice Ontario L1E 3C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 721-3520
Fax: (905) 721-6645
Address: Oshawa Clinic
117 King Street East
Oshawa Ontario L1H 1B9
Phone: (905) 723-8551
Fax: (905) 721-6645
Address: 198 Des Newman Boulevard
Whitby Ontario L1P 1Y5
Phone: 9057213548
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: W. H. Pang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Apr 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Pang (CPSO#: 73444 )
Business Address: Oshawa Clinic
117 King Street East
Oshawa Ontario L1H 1B9
(905) 723-8551
Business Address: 1450 Highway 2
Courtice Ontario L1E 3C3
(905) 723-8551
Business Address: 1290 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa Ontario L1H 7K4
(905) 723-8551

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Courtice Health Centre
1450 Highway 2
Courtice Ontario L1E 3C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 721-3520
Fax: (905) 721-6645
Address: Oshawa Clinic
117 King Street East
Oshawa Ontario L1H 1B9
Phone: (905) 723-8551
Fax: (905) 721-6645
Address: 198 Des Newman Boulevard
Whitby Ontario L1P 1Y5
Phone: 9057213548
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: W. H. Pang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Apr 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Pang (CPSO#: 73444 )
Business Address: Oshawa Clinic
117 King Street East
Oshawa Ontario L1H 1B9
(905) 723-8551
Business Address: 1450 Highway 2
Courtice Ontario L1E 3C3
(905) 723-8551
Business Address: 1290 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa Ontario L1H 7K4
(905) 723-8551

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WEI-HSI PANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PANG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WEI-HSI PANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PANG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999