THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:31:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 203-170 Simcoe St
Peterborough ON K9H 2H7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7057430030
Fax: 7057430047

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
New Zealand

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Brian Lindsay Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Aug 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Lindsay (CPSO#: 73454 )
Business Address: 201 - 270 Charlotte Street
Peterborough Ontario K9J 2V4
(705) 743-0030
Business Address: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
(705) 743-2121

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 203-170 Simcoe St
Peterborough ON K9H 2H7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7057430030
Fax: 7057430047

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
New Zealand

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Brian Lindsay Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Aug 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Lindsay (CPSO#: 73454 )
Business Address: 201 - 270 Charlotte Street
Peterborough Ontario K9J 2V4
(705) 743-0030
Business Address: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
(705) 743-2121

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRIAN GEORGE LINDSAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LINDSAY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRIAN GEORGE LINDSAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LINDSAY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999