THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:36:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
169 Main Street East
Grimsby Ontario L3M 1P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 945-2253
Extension: 450
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Grimsby

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Troy Johnson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Johnson (CPSO#: 73463 )
Business Address: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
169 Main Street East
Grimsby Ontario L3M 1P3
(905) 359-1406
Business Address: 1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington Ontario L7S 0A2
(905) 359-1400

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
169 Main Street East
Grimsby Ontario L3M 1P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 945-2253
Extension: 450
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Grimsby

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Troy Johnson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Johnson (CPSO#: 73463 )
Business Address: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
169 Main Street East
Grimsby Ontario L3M 1P3
(905) 359-1406
Business Address: 1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington Ontario L7S 0A2
(905) 359-1400

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TROY GEOFFREY JOHNSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHNSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TROY GEOFFREY JOHNSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHNSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999