THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:33:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Cambridge School of Clinical Medicine, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI, SWAHILI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 1
3460 Schmon Parkway
Thorold Ontario L2V 4Y6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 684-8521
Fax: (905) 684-4996

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System - Fort Erie Site Fort Erie
Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site Port Colborne
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Fort Erie Site
LOCATION: Fort Erie

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site
LOCATION: Port Colborne

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. El-Karim Rhemtulla Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 May 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Rhemtulla (CPSO#: 73467 )
Business Address: 1 - 3460 Schmon Parkway
Thorold Ontario L2V 4Y6
(905) 684-8521

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI, SWAHILI, URDU
Medical School: University of Cambridge School of Clinical Medicine, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 1
3460 Schmon Parkway
Thorold Ontario L2V 4Y6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 684-8521
Fax: (905) 684-4996

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System - Fort Erie Site Fort Erie
Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site Port Colborne
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Fort Erie Site
LOCATION: Fort Erie

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site
LOCATION: Port Colborne

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. El-Karim Rhemtulla Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 May 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Rhemtulla (CPSO#: 73467 )
Business Address: 1 - 3460 Schmon Parkway
Thorold Ontario L2V 4Y6
(905) 684-8521

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EL-KARIM FATEHALI JAFFER RHEMTULLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RHEMTULLA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EL-KARIM FATEHALI JAFFER RHEMTULLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RHEMTULLA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Cambridge School of Clinical Medicine, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Sep 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999