THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:31:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Bombay, 1982
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201-15 Wellesley St W
Toronto ON M4Y 0G7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647 748 4111
Fax: 647 748 4194
Address: 471 Jarvis Street
Toronto Ontario M4Y 2G8
Phone: 416 637 3030
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 27 Apr 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 27 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Minella DeSouza Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. M. DeSouza (CPSO#: 73470 )
Business Address: 87B Harbord Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1G4
(647) 748-4111
Business Address: 201-15 Wellesley St W
Toronto ON M4Y 0G7
6477484111

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Bombay, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201-15 Wellesley St W
Toronto ON M4Y 0G7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647 748 4111
Fax: 647 748 4194
Address: 471 Jarvis Street
Toronto Ontario M4Y 2G8
Phone: 416 637 3030
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 27 Apr 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 27 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Minella DeSouza Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. M. DeSouza (CPSO#: 73470 )
Business Address: 87B Harbord Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1G4
(647) 748-4111
Business Address: 201-15 Wellesley St W
Toronto ON M4Y 0G7
6477484111

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MINELLA FRANCISCA DESOUZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DESOUZA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MINELLA FRANCISCA DESOUZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DESOUZA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Bombay, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 08 Jun 2005

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jun 2005

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 2004
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999