THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:20:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, CHINESE, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 9555 Yonge St
Unit 15
Richmond Hill ON L4C 9M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416)760-6787
Fax: (416)760-6788
Address: 2130 Lawrence Ave E
Unit 307
Scarborough ON M1R 3A6
Phone: (416) 751-6141
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 385 Silver Star Boulevard
Unit 212
Toronto Ontario M1V 0E3
Phone: 416-477-5688
Fax: 416-477-5687
Address: 700-200 Windflower Gate
Woodbridge ON L4L 9C3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Y. Chen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Dec 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Chen (CPSO#: 73479 )
Business Address: 205-385 Silver Star Blvd
Scarborough ON M1V 0E3
Business Address: 700-200 Windflower Gate
Woodbridge ON L4L 9L3
Business Address: 2130 Lawrence Avenue Road
Suite 307
Scarborough Ontario M1R 3A6
Business Address: 15 - 9555 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 9M5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, CHINESE, MANDARIN
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 9555 Yonge St
Unit 15
Richmond Hill ON L4C 9M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416)760-6787
Fax: (416)760-6788
Address: 2130 Lawrence Ave E
Unit 307
Scarborough ON M1R 3A6
Phone: (416) 751-6141
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 385 Silver Star Boulevard
Unit 212
Toronto Ontario M1V 0E3
Phone: 416-477-5688
Fax: 416-477-5687
Address: 700-200 Windflower Gate
Woodbridge ON L4L 9C3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Y. Chen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Dec 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Chen (CPSO#: 73479 )
Business Address: 205-385 Silver Star Blvd
Scarborough ON M1V 0E3
Business Address: 700-200 Windflower Gate
Woodbridge ON L4L 9L3
Business Address: 2130 Lawrence Avenue Road
Suite 307
Scarborough Ontario M1R 3A6
Business Address: 15 - 9555 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 9M5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YEN-FU CHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YEN-FU CHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999