THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:30:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Clair Family Doctors
233 Cameron Street
Corunna
Sarnia Ontario N0N1G0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 8139800
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Bluewater health emergency departme
89 Norman street
Sarnia Ontario N7T6S3
Phone: 5194644400
Extension: 5214
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Bluewater RAAM clinic (BMC)
118 Victoria Street
Sarnia
Sarnia Ontario N7T2N1
Phone: 5193375000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Sep 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 17 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bluewater Health Sarnia
HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marc Austin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Sep 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Austin (CPSO#: 73482 )
Business Address: 233 Cameron Street
Corunna Ontario N0N 1G0
Business Address: 89 Norman Street
Sarnia Ontario N7T 6S3
(519) 464-4400
Business Address: 69 Grant Avenue East
Chatham Ontario N7L 1V8
Business Address: Bluewater Monitoring Consultants
118 Victoria Street North
Sarnia Ontario N7T 5W9
(519) 337-5000
Business Address: 1430 Dufferin Avenue
Wallaceburg Ontario N8A 2W5
Business Address: 233 Cameron Street
Sarnia Ontario N0N 1G0
(519) 813-9500
Business Address: 233 Cameron St
St Clair Family Doctors
Corunna ON N0N 1G0
5198139800
Business Address: 233 Cameron St
233 Cameron Stree
Corunna ON N0N 1G0
5198139800

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Clair Family Doctors
233 Cameron Street
Corunna
Sarnia Ontario N0N1G0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 8139800
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Bluewater health emergency departme
89 Norman street
Sarnia Ontario N7T6S3
Phone: 5194644400
Extension: 5214
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Bluewater RAAM clinic (BMC)
118 Victoria Street
Sarnia
Sarnia Ontario N7T2N1
Phone: 5193375000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Sep 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 17 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bluewater Health Sarnia
HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marc Austin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Sep 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Austin (CPSO#: 73482 )
Business Address: 233 Cameron Street
Corunna Ontario N0N 1G0
Business Address: 89 Norman Street
Sarnia Ontario N7T 6S3
(519) 464-4400
Business Address: 69 Grant Avenue East
Chatham Ontario N7L 1V8
Business Address: Bluewater Monitoring Consultants
118 Victoria Street North
Sarnia Ontario N7T 5W9
(519) 337-5000
Business Address: 1430 Dufferin Avenue
Wallaceburg Ontario N8A 2W5
Business Address: 233 Cameron Street
Sarnia Ontario N0N 1G0
(519) 813-9500
Business Address: 233 Cameron St
St Clair Family Doctors
Corunna ON N0N 1G0
5198139800
Business Address: 233 Cameron St
233 Cameron Stree
Corunna ON N0N 1G0
5198139800

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARC ROBERT AUSTIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AUSTIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARC ROBERT AUSTIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AUSTIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999