THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 08:02:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 205
1355 Bank Street
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 721-2907
Fax: (613) 518-6555
Address: 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8587
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nunavut
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Glenn Posner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Dec 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Posner (CPSO#: 73483 )
Business Address: 1967 Riverside Drive
7th Floor
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
(613) 738-8400
Business Address: 1355 Bank Street
Suite 205
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8K7
(613) 721-2907
Business Address: 501 Smyth Road
8th Floor
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 737-8587

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 205
1355 Bank Street
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 721-2907
Fax: (613) 518-6555
Address: 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8587
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nunavut
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Glenn Posner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Dec 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Posner (CPSO#: 73483 )
Business Address: 1967 Riverside Drive
7th Floor
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
(613) 738-8400
Business Address: 1355 Bank Street
Suite 205
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8K7
(613) 721-2907
Business Address: 501 Smyth Road
8th Floor
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 737-8587

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GLENN DAVID POSNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POSNER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GLENN DAVID POSNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POSNER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999