THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/04/25 03:41:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: Robertson, Janine Marie (Used Until: 08 Nov 2012)
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 205-460 Springbank Drive
London Ontario N6J 0A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5194726612
Fax: 8442254616

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 20 Jul 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 20 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Przysiezny Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 May 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Przysiezny (CPSO#: 73497 )

General Information

Former Name: Robertson, Janine Marie (Used Until: 08 Nov 2012)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 205-460 Springbank Drive
London Ontario N6J 0A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5194726612
Fax: 8442254616

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 20 Jul 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 20 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Przysiezny Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 May 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Przysiezny (CPSO#: 73497 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JANINE MARIE PRZYSIEZNY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRZYSIEZNY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JANINE MARIE PRZYSIEZNY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRZYSIEZNY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jul 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999