THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:00:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Trillium Cardiovascular Associates
Suite 402
89 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 848-2550
Fax: (905) 848-5037
Address: 100 QUEENSWAY WEST
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Phone: 9058487100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiac Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiac Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Noora Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Mar 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Noora (CPSO#: 73500 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Trillium Cardiovascular Associates
Suite 402
89 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 848-2550
Fax: (905) 848-5037
Address: 100 QUEENSWAY WEST
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Phone: 9058487100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiac Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiac Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Noora Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Mar 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Noora (CPSO#: 73500 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOSEPH NOORA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOORA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOSEPH NOORA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOORA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Mar 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Mar 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999