THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:25:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 465 Grand Avenue West
Chatham Ontario N7L 1C5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 354-5540
Fax: (519) 354-6120

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wheeler Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jul 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Wheeler (CPSO#: 73501 )
Business Address: 465 Grand Avenue West
Chatham Ontario N7L 1C5
(519) 354-5540
Business Address: Chatham Kent Health Alliance
80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham Ontario N7L 1B7
(519) 352-6400

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 465 Grand Avenue West
Chatham Ontario N7L 1C5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 354-5540
Fax: (519) 354-6120

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wheeler Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jul 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Wheeler (CPSO#: 73501 )
Business Address: 465 Grand Avenue West
Chatham Ontario N7L 1C5
(519) 354-5540
Business Address: Chatham Kent Health Alliance
80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham Ontario N7L 1B7
(519) 352-6400

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMES KEVIN WHEELER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHEELER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMES KEVIN WHEELER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHEELER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999