THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:38:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Beamsville Medical Centre
PO Box 430
4279 Hixon Street
Beamsville Ontario L0R 1B0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 563-5315
Fax: (905) 563-0933

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby
HOSPITAL: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Grimsby

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J.P. Woodland Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Nov 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Woodland (CPSO#: 73505 )
Business Address: 4024 23rd Street
Vineland Ontario L0R 2C0
(905) 562-7385
Business Address: Beamsville Medical Centre
P.O. Box 430
4279 Hixon Road
Beamsville Ontario L0R 1B0
(905) 563-5315
Business Address: 169 Main Street East
Grimsby Ontario L3M 1P3
(905) 945-2253

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Beamsville Medical Centre
PO Box 430
4279 Hixon Street
Beamsville Ontario L0R 1B0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 563-5315
Fax: (905) 563-0933

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby
HOSPITAL: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Grimsby

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J.P. Woodland Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Nov 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Woodland (CPSO#: 73505 )
Business Address: 4024 23rd Street
Vineland Ontario L0R 2C0
(905) 562-7385
Business Address: Beamsville Medical Centre
P.O. Box 430
4279 Hixon Road
Beamsville Ontario L0R 1B0
(905) 563-5315
Business Address: 169 Main Street East
Grimsby Ontario L3M 1P3
(905) 945-2253

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMES PAUL WOODLAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOODLAND is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMES PAUL WOODLAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOODLAND is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999