THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 03:58:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Muskoka Algonquin Health Care
Huntsville Hospital
100 Frank Miller Drive
Huntsville Ontario P1H 1H7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 789-2311
Fax: (705) 789-0057
Address: Muskoka Algonqian Healthcare
South Muskoka Memorial Hospital
75 Ann Street
Bracebridge Ontario P1L 2E4
Phone: (705) 645-4400
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Nurse Practitioner Led Clinic
5 Centre Street North
Huntsville Ontario P1H 2C1
Phone: (705) 224-6752
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Bracebridge
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
LOCATION: Bracebridge

HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Huntsville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Allan Simpson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Jun 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Simpson (CPSO#: 73507 )
Business Address: Muskoka Algonqiun Healthcare
South Muskoka Memorial Hospital
75 Ann Street
Bracebridge Ontario P1L 2E4
(705) 645-4400
Business Address: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
Huntsville Hospital
100 Frank Miller Drive
Huntsville Ontario P1H 1H7
(705) 789-2311
Business Address: Nurse Practitioner Led Clinic
5 Centre Street North
Huntsville Ontario P1H 2C1
(705) 224-6752

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Muskoka Algonquin Health Care
Huntsville Hospital
100 Frank Miller Drive
Huntsville Ontario P1H 1H7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 789-2311
Fax: (705) 789-0057
Address: Muskoka Algonqian Healthcare
South Muskoka Memorial Hospital
75 Ann Street
Bracebridge Ontario P1L 2E4
Phone: (705) 645-4400
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Nurse Practitioner Led Clinic
5 Centre Street North
Huntsville Ontario P1H 2C1
Phone: (705) 224-6752
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Bracebridge
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
LOCATION: Bracebridge

HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Huntsville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Allan Simpson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Jun 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Simpson (CPSO#: 73507 )
Business Address: Muskoka Algonqiun Healthcare
South Muskoka Memorial Hospital
75 Ann Street
Bracebridge Ontario P1L 2E4
(705) 645-4400
Business Address: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
Huntsville Hospital
100 Frank Miller Drive
Huntsville Ontario P1H 1H7
(705) 789-2311
Business Address: Nurse Practitioner Led Clinic
5 Centre Street North
Huntsville Ontario P1H 2C1
(705) 224-6752

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN ALLAN SIMPSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIMPSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN ALLAN SIMPSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIMPSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999