THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:25:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Diagnostic Radiology
St Joseph's Health Care London
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 646-6035
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
Four Counties Health Services Newbury
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Durham-Memorial Site Durham
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
South Huron Hospital Association Exeter
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Chesley Site Chesley
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton Site Walkerton
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: Alexandra Hospital
LOCATION: Ingersoll

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre
LOCATION: Walkerton

HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

HOSPITAL: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
LOCATION: Strathroy

HOSPITAL: Four Counties Health Services
LOCATION: Newbury

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre Durham-Memorial Site
LOCATION: Durham

HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

HOSPITAL: South Huron Hospital Association
LOCATION: Exeter

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre Chesley Site
LOCATION: Chesley

HOSPITAL: Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Tillsonburg

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton Site
LOCATION: Walkerton

HOSPITAL: Alexandra Marine and General Hospital
LOCATION: Goderich

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ali Islam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Sep 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Islam (CPSO#: 73527 )
Business Address: 167 Rolph Street
Tillsonburg Ontario N4G 3Y0
(519) 842-3611
Business Address: 24 Huron Street West
SS 2
Exeter Ontario N0M 1S2
(519) 235-2700
Business Address: 255 Elizabeth Street East
Listowel Ontario N4W 2P5
(519) 291-2813
Business Address: 90 7th Avenue
Hanover Ontario N4N 1N1
(519) 364-2340
Business Address: 189 Elm Street
St Thomas Ontario N5R 5C4
(519) 631-2030
Business Address: 39 - 2nd Street SE
Chesley Ontario N0G 1L0
(519) 363-2340
Business Address: 268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 646-6035
Business Address: Alexandra Marine and General Hospital
120 Napier Street
Goderich Ontario N7A 1W5
(519) 524-8689
Business Address: 270 Carling Terrace
Wingham Ontario N9G 2W0
(519) 357-3688
Business Address: 320 College Street
Durham Ontario N0G 1R0
(519) 369-2340
Business Address: 1609 Stittsville Main
Stittsville Ontario K2S 1N5
Business Address: South Bruce Grey Health Care
21 McGivern Street West
Walkerton Ontario N0G 2V0
(519) 881-1220
Business Address: 80 Grand Avenue
Chatham Ontario N7L 2V7
(519) 352-6400
Business Address: Alexandra Hospital
29 Noxon Street
Ingersoll Ontario N5C 3V6
(519) 485-1700
Business Address: 395 Carrie Street
Strathroy Ontario N7G 3C9
(519) 245-1550
Business Address: 1824 Concession Drive
R R 3
Newbury Ontario N0L 1Z0
Business Address: 450 Central Avenue
London Ontario N6B 2E8
(519) 672-5270
Business Address: 43 Queen Street
Kincardine Ontario N2Z 1G6
(519) 396-3331

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Diagnostic Radiology
St Joseph's Health Care London
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 646-6035
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
Four Counties Health Services Newbury
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Durham-Memorial Site Durham
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
South Huron Hospital Association Exeter
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Chesley Site Chesley
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton Site Walkerton
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: Alexandra Hospital
LOCATION: Ingersoll

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre
LOCATION: Walkerton

HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

HOSPITAL: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
LOCATION: Strathroy

HOSPITAL: Four Counties Health Services
LOCATION: Newbury

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre Durham-Memorial Site
LOCATION: Durham

HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

HOSPITAL: South Huron Hospital Association
LOCATION: Exeter

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre Chesley Site
LOCATION: Chesley

HOSPITAL: Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Tillsonburg

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton Site
LOCATION: Walkerton

HOSPITAL: Alexandra Marine and General Hospital
LOCATION: Goderich

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ali Islam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Sep 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Islam (CPSO#: 73527 )
Business Address: 167 Rolph Street
Tillsonburg Ontario N4G 3Y0
(519) 842-3611
Business Address: 24 Huron Street West
SS 2
Exeter Ontario N0M 1S2
(519) 235-2700
Business Address: 255 Elizabeth Street East
Listowel Ontario N4W 2P5
(519) 291-2813
Business Address: 90 7th Avenue
Hanover Ontario N4N 1N1
(519) 364-2340
Business Address: 189 Elm Street
St Thomas Ontario N5R 5C4
(519) 631-2030
Business Address: 39 - 2nd Street SE
Chesley Ontario N0G 1L0
(519) 363-2340
Business Address: 268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 646-6035
Business Address: Alexandra Marine and General Hospital
120 Napier Street
Goderich Ontario N7A 1W5
(519) 524-8689
Business Address: 270 Carling Terrace
Wingham Ontario N9G 2W0
(519) 357-3688
Business Address: 320 College Street
Durham Ontario N0G 1R0
(519) 369-2340
Business Address: 1609 Stittsville Main
Stittsville Ontario K2S 1N5
Business Address: South Bruce Grey Health Care
21 McGivern Street West
Walkerton Ontario N0G 2V0
(519) 881-1220
Business Address: 80 Grand Avenue
Chatham Ontario N7L 2V7
(519) 352-6400
Business Address: Alexandra Hospital
29 Noxon Street
Ingersoll Ontario N5C 3V6
(519) 485-1700
Business Address: 395 Carrie Street
Strathroy Ontario N7G 3C9
(519) 245-1550
Business Address: 1824 Concession Drive
R R 3
Newbury Ontario N0L 1Z0
Business Address: 450 Central Avenue
London Ontario N6B 2E8
(519) 672-5270
Business Address: 43 Queen Street
Kincardine Ontario N2Z 1G6
(519) 396-3331

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALI ISLAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ISLAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALI ISLAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ISLAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 May 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 May 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999