THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 02:47:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite #103
1400 St. Laurent Blvd
Ottawa Ontario K1K 4H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 746-6034
Fax: 613-746-1167
Address: Suite 2600
1125 Colonel By Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1S 5B6
Phone: 613-520-6674
Fax: 613-520-4059
Address: Queensway Carleton Hospital
Covid Assessment Centre
595 Moodie Drive
Ottawa Ontario K2H8A8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 154 Civic Centre Rd
Petawawa Ontario K8H 3H5
Phone: (613) 687-7641
Fax: 613-687-6808

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jul 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 11 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Janet Chow Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Apr 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Chow (CPSO#: 73535 )
Business Address: 2600 - 1125 Colonel By Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1S 5B6
(613) 520-6674
Business Address: 103 - 1400 St. Laurent Boulevard
Ottawa Ontario K1K 4H4
(613) 663-2541
Business Address: 154 Civic Centre Rd
Petawawa ON K8H 3H5
613-687-7641
Business Address: 58 Aylmer Ave
Ottawa Ontario K1s2x3
613-730-3671

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite #103
1400 St. Laurent Blvd
Ottawa Ontario K1K 4H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 746-6034
Fax: 613-746-1167
Address: Suite 2600
1125 Colonel By Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1S 5B6
Phone: 613-520-6674
Fax: 613-520-4059
Address: Queensway Carleton Hospital
Covid Assessment Centre
595 Moodie Drive
Ottawa Ontario K2H8A8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 154 Civic Centre Rd
Petawawa Ontario K8H 3H5
Phone: (613) 687-7641
Fax: 613-687-6808

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jul 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 11 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Janet Chow Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Apr 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Chow (CPSO#: 73535 )
Business Address: 2600 - 1125 Colonel By Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1S 5B6
(613) 520-6674
Business Address: 103 - 1400 St. Laurent Boulevard
Ottawa Ontario K1K 4H4
(613) 663-2541
Business Address: 154 Civic Centre Rd
Petawawa ON K8H 3H5
613-687-7641
Business Address: 58 Aylmer Ave
Ottawa Ontario K1s2x3
613-730-3671

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JANET ALLISON CHOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOW is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JANET ALLISON CHOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOW is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 07 May 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jul 2002

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 07 May 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999