THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:29:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: Hollett, Jackie Roxane (Used Until: 08 Dec 1999)
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 373 Commissioners Road West
Omega Fertility Center
GREI
London Ontario N6J 1Y4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196466103
Fax: 5196855519
Address: OMEGA Fertility Clinic
107 - 555 Southdale Rd. E.
London Ontario N6E 1A2
Phone: 519-685-5559
Fax: 519-685-5519
Address: St Joseph's Hospital
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6103
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 800 Commissioners Road East
professional block - E Tower
GREI
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Phone: 5196858500
Extension: 33993
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Hollett-Caines Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Oct 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Hollett-Caines (CPSO#: 73542 )
Business Address: St Joseph's Health Care
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 646-6103
Business Address: 373 Commissioners Rd W
Omega Fertility Center
London ON N6J 1Y4
519-646-6103

General Information

Former Name: Hollett, Jackie Roxane (Used Until: 08 Dec 1999)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 373 Commissioners Road West
Omega Fertility Center
GREI
London Ontario N6J 1Y4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196466103
Fax: 5196855519
Address: OMEGA Fertility Clinic
107 - 555 Southdale Rd. E.
London Ontario N6E 1A2
Phone: 519-685-5559
Fax: 519-685-5519
Address: St Joseph's Hospital
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6103
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 800 Commissioners Road East
professional block - E Tower
GREI
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Phone: 5196858500
Extension: 33993
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Hollett-Caines Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Oct 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Hollett-Caines (CPSO#: 73542 )
Business Address: St Joseph's Health Care
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 646-6103
Business Address: 373 Commissioners Rd W
Omega Fertility Center
London ON N6J 1Y4
519-646-6103

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JACKIE ROXANE HOLLETT-CAINES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOLLETT-CAINES is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JACKIE ROXANE HOLLETT-CAINES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOLLETT-CAINES is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jul 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999