THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 03:36:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 101-212 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M4P 0A3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 347-7294
Fax: (416) 287-9517

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: All medical records have been transferred to Dr. Collins Egbujuo on August 1st, 2019
Date Received: 23 Aug 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Siobhan Maharaj Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Maharaj (CPSO#: 73545 )
Business Address: 101-212 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M4P 0A3
(647) 347-7294

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 101-212 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M4P 0A3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 347-7294
Fax: (416) 287-9517

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: All medical records have been transferred to Dr. Collins Egbujuo on August 1st, 2019
Date Received: 23 Aug 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Siobhan Maharaj Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Maharaj (CPSO#: 73545 )
Business Address: 101-212 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M4P 0A3
(647) 347-7294

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SIOBHAN CLARE DEONARINE MAHARAJ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAHARAJ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SIOBHAN CLARE DEONARINE MAHARAJ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAHARAJ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jul 2001

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999