THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 04:10:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Trillium Health Partners C-Site
Department of Oncology
Floor 4F
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 813 4023
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 20 Sep 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Blair D. Ernst Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Mar 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Ernst (CPSO#: 73549 )
Business Address: Credit Valley Hospital
Department of Oncology
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(905) 813-1100 Extn: 5130
Business Address: Credit Valley Hospital
Department of Hematology
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(905) 813-1100 Extn: 5331

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Trillium Health Partners C-Site
Department of Oncology
Floor 4F
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 813 4023
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 20 Sep 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Blair D. Ernst Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Mar 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Ernst (CPSO#: 73549 )
Business Address: Credit Valley Hospital
Department of Oncology
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(905) 813-1100 Extn: 5130
Business Address: Credit Valley Hospital
Department of Hematology
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(905) 813-1100 Extn: 5331

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BLAIR DAVID ERNST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ERNST is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BLAIR DAVID ERNST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ERNST is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jun 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999