THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 04:45:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Waypoint Centre for Mental Health
500 Church Street
Penetanguishene Ontario L9M 1G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7055493181
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care Penetanguishene
HOSPITAL: Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care
LOCATION: Penetanguishene

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Meeder Zacharias Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Nov 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Meeder (CPSO#: 73406 ) Dr. R. Zacharias (CPSO#: 73550 )
Business Address: Waypoint Centre for Mental Health
500 Church Street
Penetanguishene Ontario L9M 1G3
(705) 526-0567

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Waypoint Centre for Mental Health
500 Church Street
Penetanguishene Ontario L9M 1G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7055493181
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care Penetanguishene
HOSPITAL: Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care
LOCATION: Penetanguishene

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Meeder Zacharias Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Nov 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Meeder (CPSO#: 73406 ) Dr. R. Zacharias (CPSO#: 73550 )
Business Address: Waypoint Centre for Mental Health
500 Church Street
Penetanguishene Ontario L9M 1G3
(705) 526-0567

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROSEMARY ZACHARIAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZACHARIAS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROSEMARY ZACHARIAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZACHARIAS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999