THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/05/25 03:34:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Durham Regional Cancer Center
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Extension: 32804
Fax: (905) 721-6101

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 15 Sep 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Northumberland Hills Hospital Cobourg
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Northumberland Hills Hospital
LOCATION: Cobourg

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Leta M. Forbes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Forbes (CPSO#: 73551 )
Business Address: Durham Region Cancer Centre
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
905 576 8711 Extn: 33625

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Durham Regional Cancer Center
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Extension: 32804
Fax: (905) 721-6101

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 15 Sep 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Northumberland Hills Hospital Cobourg
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Northumberland Hills Hospital
LOCATION: Cobourg

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Leta M. Forbes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Forbes (CPSO#: 73551 )
Business Address: Durham Region Cancer Centre
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
905 576 8711 Extn: 33625

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LETA MARIE FORBES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FORBES is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LETA MARIE FORBES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FORBES is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Oct 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Oct 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999