THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/05/25 03:48:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 23 Kenyon Street East
PO Box 1630
Alexandria Ontario K0C 1A0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-525-0161`
Fax: 613-209-1551

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lucie Lajoie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Feb 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Lajoie (CPSO#: 73554 )
Business Address: 20260 County Road 43
P.O. Box 1630
Alexandria Ontario K0C 1A0
(613) 525-0161
Business Address: 20494 River Rd
Alexandria ON K0C 1A0
613-525-0161
Business Address: PO Box 1630
23 Kenyon St East
Alexandria ON K0C 1A0

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 23 Kenyon Street East
PO Box 1630
Alexandria Ontario K0C 1A0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-525-0161`
Fax: 613-209-1551

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lucie Lajoie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Feb 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Lajoie (CPSO#: 73554 )
Business Address: 20260 County Road 43
P.O. Box 1630
Alexandria Ontario K0C 1A0
(613) 525-0161
Business Address: 20494 River Rd
Alexandria ON K0C 1A0
613-525-0161
Business Address: PO Box 1630
23 Kenyon St East
Alexandria ON K0C 1A0

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LUCIE LAJOIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAJOIE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LUCIE LAJOIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAJOIE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 07 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2002

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 07 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999