THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 04:38:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1201 Queen Street
Kincardine Ontario N2Z 3C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 396-6767
Fax: (866) 685-0058

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton
HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre
LOCATION: Walkerton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lisa Roth Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Roth (CPSO#: 73570 )
Business Address: 1199 Queen Street
Kincardine Ontario N2Z 1G6
(519) 396-3331
Business Address: 1201 Queen Street
Kincardine Ontario N2Z 3C1
(519) 396-6767
Business Address: 550 Philip Place
Kincardine Ontario N2Z 3A6
(519) 396-4400

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1201 Queen Street
Kincardine Ontario N2Z 3C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 396-6767
Fax: (866) 685-0058

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton
HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre
LOCATION: Walkerton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lisa Roth Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Roth (CPSO#: 73570 )
Business Address: 1199 Queen Street
Kincardine Ontario N2Z 1G6
(519) 396-3331
Business Address: 1201 Queen Street
Kincardine Ontario N2Z 3C1
(519) 396-6767
Business Address: 550 Philip Place
Kincardine Ontario N2Z 3A6
(519) 396-4400

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LISA ROSANNE ROTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROTH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LISA ROSANNE ROTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROTH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999